RI H8023 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates repealed statute references and creates a mechanism for employees to enforce their existing right to continuation of medical benefits, reinstatement of status after returning from being a temporary caregiver and Sunday pay wage laws.
Title
Payment Of Wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2018) |
2018-03-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8023.pdf |