RI H7984 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND HOUSING RESOURCES ACT OF 1998 - Provides that mobile and manufactured homes be included as affordable housing under certain conditions.
Title
Provides that mobile and manufactured homes be included as affordable housing under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-14 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-14 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2024-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2024) |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2024-04-30 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-04-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-22 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND HOUSING RESOURCES ACT OF 1998
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND HOUSING RESOURCES ACT OF 1998