RI H7961 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- RESIDENTIAL LANDLORD AND TENANT ACT - Imposes a fine up to $150 a day on a landlord for failure to deliver a copy of a state or local housing code violation to each residential tenant and a notice to prospective tenants of the building affected by said violation within 30 days of its receipt.
Title
Imposes a fine up to $150 a day on a landlord for failure to deliver a copy of a state or local housing code violation to each residential tenant and a notice to prospective tenants of the building affected by said violation within 30 days of its receipt.
Sponsors
Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Jennifer Stewart [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Enrique Sanchez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7961.pdf |