RI H7957 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends various statutes in connection with the administrative powers of the department of business regulation in order to provide consistency with respect to the penalty – related provisions governing the businesses subject to the statutes.
Title
Relating To Business Regulations
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2016) |
2016-03-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7957.pdf |