RI H7956 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Places limitations on the tax-exempt real and personal property a private nonprofit college or university may hold.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-14 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/17/2022) |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7956.pdf |