RI H7950 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the cost to operate all lighting equipment located on state roads would be the responsibility of the state and not the municipality where the lighting equipment is located.
Title
Street Lights On State Roads
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] |
Rep. Michael Marcello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7950.pdf |