RI H7948 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- ZONING ORDINANCES - Provides amendments to the requirements of the inclusionary zoning law for affordable housing development.
Title
Provides amendments to the requirements of the inclusionary zoning law for affordable housing development.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Brandon Voas [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2024-04-09 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-04-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/09/2024) |
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-03 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |