RI H7945 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY LICENSURE COMPACT - Creates the occupational therapy licensure compact that would allow licensed occupational therapists and occupational therapy assistants to practice in all states that join the compact.
Title
Creates the occupational therapy licensure compact that would allow licensed occupational therapists and occupational therapy assistants to practice in all states that join the compact.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-12 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2024) |
2024-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-06-07 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2024) |
2024-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |