RI H7910 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides reasons for an innkeeper to remove guests from a hotel, and permits an innkeeper to refuse admission to a person under eighteen (18) years of age.
Title
Hotels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-20 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2022) |
2022-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |