RI H7910 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Refuse Disposal (would Require The Rhode Island Resource Recovery Corporation To Establish An Off-site Air Quality Monitoring System.)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Refuse Disposal (would Require The Rhode Island Resource Recovery Corporation To Establish An Off-site Air Quality Monitoring System.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-06-13 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-11 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-06-08 | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2012) | |
2012-05-29 | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study | |
2012-05-29 | Committee recommended indefinite postponement | |
2012-05-25 | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2012) | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture | |
2012-05-17 | House read and passed | |
2012-05-08 | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2012) | |
2012-05-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-05-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2012) | |
2012-04-12 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-09 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2012) | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7910.pdf |