RI H7904 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definition of employees to include individuals under appointment/contract/apprenticeship/volunteer or unpaid intern covered by fair employment practices.
Title
Fair Employments Practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7904.pdf |