RI H7892 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and restates the charter of the Greater Providence YMCA and provides for governance by a board of directors.
Title
In Amendment And Consolidation Of The Charter Of The Greater Providence Young Men's Christian Association
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/16/2018) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2018-04-25 | House | House read and passed |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-03-30 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/03/2018) |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |