RI H7890 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the state career pathways system of the workforce board to create pathways and workforce training programs to fill skill gaps and employment opportunities in the clean energy sector.
Title
Governor's Workforce Board
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2016) |
2016-03-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2016) |
2016-03-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |