RI H7889 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline (would Add A Definition For Medical Records To The Current Statute)
Title
An Act Relating To The Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline (would Add A Definition For Medical Records To The Current Statute)
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Leo Medina [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-22 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-22 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-05-17 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/22/2012) | |
2012-05-16 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-05-14 | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2012) | |
2012-05-10 | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services | |
2012-05-03 | House read and passed | |
2012-04-25 | Placed on House Calendar (05/03/2012) | |
2012-04-25 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-04-23 | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2012) | |
2012-04-04 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2012) | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7889.pdf |