RI H7888 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Food And Drugs - The Edward O. Hawkins And Thomas C. Slater Medical Marijuana Act (would Fine-tune Certain Provisions Of The Chapter On Medical Marijuana)
Title
An Act Relating To Food And Drugs - The Edward O. Hawkins And Thomas C. Slater Medical Marijuana Act (would Fine-tune Certain Provisions Of The Chapter On Medical Marijuana)
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-29 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-05-23 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/29/2012) | |
2012-05-16 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-05-09 | Placed on House Calendar (05/16/2012) | |
2012-05-09 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-15 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2012) | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7888.pdf |