RI H7882 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a referendum to be submitted at the November 2016 election which would authorize the issuance of twenty million dollars ($20,000,000) in bonds to develop an innovation campus at the University of Rhode Island.
Title
University Of Rhode Island Innovation Campus
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2016) |
2016-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7882.pdf |