RI H7882 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act In Accordance With Rhode Island General Laws Section 16-7-44 Approving The Issuance Of Not To Exceed $50,962,000 Lease Revenue Bonds Or Other Evidences Of Indebtedness By The Providence Public Buildings Authority To Provide Funding For "warm, Safe And Dry" Projects In Providence Public Schools
Title
An Act In Accordance With Rhode Island General Laws Section 16-7-44 Approving The Issuance Of Not To Exceed $50,962,000 Lease Revenue Bonds Or Other Evidences Of Indebtedness By The Providence Public Buildings Authority To Provide Funding For "warm, Safe And Dry" Projects In Providence Public Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. John Desimone [D] | Rep. Joanne Giannini [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Rep. Peter Wasylyk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-09 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | House passed Sub A | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-06-01 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7882.pdf |