RI H7873 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance - Minimum Physicians' Payment Act Of 2012 (would Require Health Insurers To Reimburse Physicians No Less Than One Hundred Forty Percent (140%) Of What Medicare Would Pay The Physician For Providing The Same Service)
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance - Minimum Physicians' Payment Act Of 2012 (would Require Health Insurers To Reimburse Physicians No Less Than One Hundred Forty Percent (140%) Of What Medicare Would Pay The Physician For Providing The Same Service)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-12 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2012) | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7873.pdf |