RI H7869 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the sale or offer for sale of any flavored electronic nicotine-delivery system.
Title
Department Of Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-28 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7869.pdf |