RI H7868 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain businesses and educational facilities that produce at least 52 tons of organic-waste yearly and are located within 30 miles of an authorized composting facility to use authorized methods of recycling.
Title
Refuse Disposal
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2020) |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7868.pdf |