RI H7866 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits specifically designated and authorized persons to access the confidential health care information of the designating individual from the health information exchange.
Title
The Rhode Island Health Information Exchange Act Of 2008
Sponsors
Rep. David Coughlin [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-07 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2016-05-12 | House | House read and passed |
2016-05-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/04/2016) |
2016-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2016) |
2016-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |