RI H7859 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Military Affairs And Defense (would Allow The Rhode Island National Guard To Participate In The Forfeiture Of Money And Assets Seized Through Counterdrug Operations In Which Members Of The Guard Support Federal, State Or Municipal Efforts)
Title
An Act Relating To Military Affairs And Defense (would Allow The Rhode Island National Guard To Participate In The Forfeiture Of Money And Assets Seized Through Counterdrug Operations In Which Members Of The Guard Support Federal, State Or Municipal Efforts)
Sponsors
Rep. David Caprio [D] | Rep. David Caprio [D] | Rep. Douglas Gablinske [D] | Rep. Raymond Sullivan [D] |
Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-05-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-18 | Committee continued | |
2010-05-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-11 | Committee continued | |
2010-05-11 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7859.pdf |