RI H7856 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/06/2018)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides a stipend up to $450 to retirees in years when there are no cost of living adjustments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement System - Contributions And Benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (06/06/2018)
2018-06-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback