RI H7856 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/06/2018)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/06/2018)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a stipend up to $450 to retirees in years when there are no cost of living adjustments.
Title
Retirement System - Contributions And Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/06/2018) |
2018-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7856.pdf |