RI H7852 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from sales tax any amount a construction contractor charges its clients for materials and supplies in connection with a construction contract.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes--liability And Computation
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7852.pdf |