RI H7850 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Elizabeth Ann Voro to join Michael J. Fournier and David A. Liddle in marriage on or about May 18, 2014, within the City of Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7850.pdf |