RI H7847 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Be Known As The "rhode Island City And Town Revaluation Study Commission" (creates A 15 Member "rhode Island City And Town Revaluation Study Commission," To Study And Make Recommendations Legislation To Set Property Value For Local Tax Purposes, And Who Would Report Back By 1/7/2021, And Expire On March 7, 2021.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Be Known As The "rhode Island City And Town Revaluation Study Commission" (creates A 15 Member "rhode Island City And Town Revaluation Study Commission," To Study And Make Recommendations Legislation To Set Property Value For Local Tax Purposes, And Who Would Report Back By 1/7/2021, And Expire On March 7, 2021.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/12/2020) |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7847.pdf |