RI H7847 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require a notice and opportunity to be heard by the public with regard to the permitting of wastewater treatment facilities.
Title
Wastewater Treatment Plants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7847.pdf |