RI H7845 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- HUMAN SERVICES FTE ACCOUNTABILITY PORTAL - Directs the department of administration to establish a human services transparency FTE portal.
Title
Directs the department of administration to establish a human services transparency FTE portal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2024) |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- HUMAN SERVICES FTE ACCOUNTABILITY PORTAL
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- HUMAN SERVICES FTE ACCOUNTABILITY PORTAL
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7845.pdf |