RI H7841 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 House Municipal Government & Housing Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 House Municipal Government & Housing Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES -- RETAIL LICENSES - Exempts the property located at 94 Carpenter Street in Providence from the general law prohibiting liquor licenses within a certain proximity to schools or churches.
Title
Exempts the property located at 94 Carpenter Street in Providence from the general law prohibiting liquor licenses within a certain proximity to schools or churches.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2024) |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7841.pdf |