RI H7840 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ANIMALS AND ANIMAL HUSBANDRY -- REGULATION OF VICIOUS DOGS - Revises the procedures followed when a vicious dog is seized and delivered to the Rhode Island Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals.
Title
Revises the procedures followed when a vicious dog is seized and delivered to the Rhode Island Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024) |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7840.pdf |