RI H7835 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-10 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-10 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Property -- Commercial Leasing--interest (would Forbid The Charging Of Interest Or Late Charges On Any Payment Prior To Receipt Of Actual Possession Of A Leasehold, Space Or Property By The Individual Entitled To Possession)
Title
An Act Relating To Property -- Commercial Leasing--interest (would Forbid The Charging Of Interest Or Late Charges On Any Payment Prior To Receipt Of Actual Possession Of A Leasehold, Space Or Property By The Individual Entitled To Possession)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | House read and passed | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-03-17 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-17 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7835.pdf |