RI H7831 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY -- JURY LISTS - Amends the jury list and jury qualification statutes to add individuals receiving public assistance benefits.
Title
Amends the jury list and jury qualification statutes to add individuals receiving public assistance benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts And Civil Procedure
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY -- JURY LISTS
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY -- JURY LISTS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7831.pdf |