RI H7829 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals ยง14-1-61 regarding the placement for costs and expenses for certain complaints filed in family court, and chapter 4 of title 14, which establishes the O'Rourke Children's Center.
Title
Proceedings In Family Court
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2016) |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7829.pdf |