RI H7823 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the fast-start office to regularly convene business owners in the state to gather recommendations to improve business licensing procedures.
Title
Business Fast-start Office
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7823.pdf |