RI H7819 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a special license plate for Rhode Island Boy Scouts, a nonprofit corporation, and establish the fees and other conditions applicable to its issuance.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles -- Special Plate For Rhode Island Boy Scouts
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-06-21 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |