RI H7816 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Expedites the foreclosure procedure on vacant property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Sales

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-21HouseSenate passed as amended in concurrence
2018-06-20HousePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
2018-06-18HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-14HouseReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-06-12SenateHouse passed as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-12HouseHouse passed floor amendment only
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/12/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-04-25HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-03-08HouseCommittee transferred to House Judiciary
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback