RI H7816 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Adds biological/interchangeable biological products to the category of medications pharmacies may dispense, and regulates the procedures for dispensation/substitution.
Title
Pharmacies
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-13 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-08 | House | Meeting postponed (06/08/2016) |
2016-06-03 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration |
2016-06-01 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2016) |
2016-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/27/2016) |
2016-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2016) |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |