RI H7816 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the RI Municipal Performance Management Program funded by the DOA with the goal of improving the delivery of services to government. Requires the funding of a scholarship program to accomplish this goal.
Title
Rhode Island Municipal Performance Management Program
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Doreen Costa [R] |
Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2014) |
2014-04-07 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/08/2014) |
2014-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7816.pdf |