RI H7808 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Caps the system benefit charge at the annual published Consumer Price Index or two and one-half percent (2.5%), whichever is greater.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Least Cost Procurement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018)
2018-04-24HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (04/24/2018)
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-04-12HouseCommittee transferred to House Corporations
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback