RI H7798 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the director of environmental management to implement various new policies to improve service for customers.
Title
Department Of Environmental Management
Sponsors
Rep. Helio Melo [D] | Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] |
Rep. Larry Valencia [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2014) |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2014-03-20 | House | Meeting postponed (03/27/2014) |
2014-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7798.pdf |