RI H7795 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- LABOR AND PAYMENT OF DEBTS BY CONTRACTORS - Prohibits contractors and subcontractors from paying employees the cash equivalent of any applicable healthcare benefit in lieu of actually purchasing the healthcare benefit. Violations would be subject to civil fines.
Title
Prohibits contractors and subcontractors from paying employees the cash equivalent of any applicable healthcare benefit in lieu of actually purchasing the healthcare benefit. Violations would be subject to civil fines.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-18 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2024) |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7795.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7795A.pdf |