RI H7795 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount of funds distributed to the city or town where meals and beverages are sold from one percent (1%) in FY 2016 to eight percent (8%) in FY 2024 annually at a rate of 1% per fiscal year budget surplus in corresponding fiscal year.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes - Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Rep. Jan Malik [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2016) |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7795.pdf |