RI H7787 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes a facility's potential detrimental impact on the community as a factor to be considered when approving the construction or operation of a solid waste management facility.
Title
Refuse Disposal
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Helder Cunha [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2018) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-06-05 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2018) |
2018-05-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |