RI H7785 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DIGITAL ASSET KEYS -- PROHIBITION OF PRODUCTION OF PRIVATE KEYS - Prohibits the compelled production of a private key as it relates to a digital asset, digital identity or other interest or right.
Title
Prohibits the compelled production of a private key as it relates to a digital asset, digital identity or other interest or right.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Jon Brien [D] |
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Matthew Dawson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DIGITAL ASSET KEYS
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DIGITAL ASSET KEYS -- PROHIBITION OF PRODUCTION OF PRIVATE KEYS
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DIGITAL ASSET KEYS
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DIGITAL ASSET KEYS -- PROHIBITION OF PRODUCTION OF PRIVATE KEYS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7785.pdf |