RI H7777 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND COMMERCE CORPORATION -- RHODE ISLAND -- IRELAND TRADE COMMISSION - Establishes trade commission to advance economic interests of Rhode Island and Ireland.
Title
Establishes trade commission to advance economic interests of Rhode Island and Ireland.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2024) |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND COMMERCE CORPORATION
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND COMMERCE CORPORATION -- RHODE ISLAND
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND COMMERCE CORPORATION -- RHODE ISLAND -- IRELAND TRADE COMMISSION
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND COMMERCE CORPORATION
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND COMMERCE CORPORATION -- RHODE ISLAND
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND COMMERCE CORPORATION -- RHODE ISLAND -- IRELAND TRADE COMMISSION
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7777.pdf |