RI H7777 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts the National Association of Insurance Commissioners Model Act regarding data security to establish standards for data security and standards for the investigation of and notification to the commissioner of a cybersecurity event.
Title
Insurance Data Security Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2022-04-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-04-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-04-08 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |