RI H7774 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $78,000,000 To The Rhode Island Transit Authority (ripta) (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $78,000,000 To The Rhode Island Public Transit Authority.)
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING AN APPROPRIATION OF $78,000,000 TO THE RHODE ISLAND TRANSIT AUTHORITY (RIPTA) (This resolution would authorize the appropriation of the sum of $78,000,000 to the Rhode Island Public Transit Authority.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2024) |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7774.pdf |