RI H7772 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of Approximately $30,000,000 To Rhode Island's Public Schools For Safety And Security Improvements (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $100,000 To Each Public School In Rhode Island For School Safety And Security Improvements.)
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING AN APPROPRIATION OF APPROXIMATELY $30,000,000 TO RHODE ISLAND'S PUBLIC SCHOOLS FOR SAFETY AND SECURITY IMPROVEMENTS (This resolution would authorize the appropriation of the sum of $100,000 to each public school in Rhode Island for school safety and security improvements.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing (04/30/2024) |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7772.pdf |