RI H7770 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Qualifies mobile and manufactured homes as affordable housing when installed and affixed in mobile and manufactured home parks in groups of twenty (20) or more for a year or more.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile And Manufactured Homes--affordable Housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2018)
2018-03-08HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018)
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback